MO HB2795 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-31 - Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Administrative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-31 - Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Administrative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to the recreation sales tax for certain counties
Title
Modifies provisions relating to the recreation sales tax for certain counties
Sponsors
Rep. Barry Hovis [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-31 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2022-03-31 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-03-31 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2022-03-31 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2022-03-24 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2022-03-10 | House | Referred: Local Government(H) |
2022-02-25 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2022-02-24 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |