MO HB2791 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-22 - Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H)
Pending: House Special Committee on Government Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-22 - Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H)
Pending: House Special Committee on Government Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies a Supreme Court Rule relating to the court filing information sheet
Title
Modifies a Supreme Court Rule relating to the court filing information sheet
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-22 | House | Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H) |
2022-03-03 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Government Oversight(H) |
2022-02-25 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2022-02-24 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |