MO HB2763 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-05 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-05 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the Science, Technology, Engineering, and Mathematics (STEM) Grant program for Access Missouri Financial Assistance Program award recipients
Title
Establishes the Science, Technology, Engineering, and Mathematics (STEM) Grant program for Access Missouri Financial Assistance Program award recipients
Sponsors
Rep. Don Mayhew [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-05 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2022-04-07 | House | Referred: Higher Education(H) |
2022-02-24 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2022-02-23 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |