MO HB2754 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-07 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-07 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to the new business facilities tax credit
Title
Modifies provisions relating to the new business facilities tax credit
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Brown [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2022-03-31 | House | Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H) |
2022-03-10 | House | Referred: Economic Development(H) |
2022-02-24 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2022-02-23 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |