MO HB275 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-11 - Second read and referred: Senate Transportation, Infrastructure, and Public Safety(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits the use of automated traffic enforcement systems, and requires any political subdivision to complete or terminate any automated traffic enforcement contract within one year

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits the use of automated traffic enforcement systems, and requires any political subdivision to complete or terminate any automated traffic enforcement contract within one year

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-03 - House - House: HB 275 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 125 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-11SenateSecond read and referred: Senate Transportation, Infrastructure, and Public Safety(S)
2017-04-03HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2017-04-03HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 125 NOES: 30 PRESENT: 0
2017-04-03HouseTaken Up
2017-03-29HousePerfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 2, HA 1 to HA 3, HA 3 as amended adopted
2017-03-29HouseHCS Adopted (H)
2017-03-29HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2017-03-29HouseTaken Up
2017-03-02HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
2017-03-01HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2017-03-01HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2017-02-09HouseReferred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
2017-02-09HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0
2017-01-31HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2017-01-31HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2017-01-24HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2017-01-12HouseReferred: Special Committee on Government Oversight(H)
2017-01-05HouseRead Second Time (H)
2017-01-04HouseRead First Time (H)
2016-12-19HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback