MO HB275 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-17 - Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H)
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions relating to tax rates

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions relating to tax rates

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-17HousePublic Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H)
2015-02-24HouseReferred: Ways and Means(H)
2015-01-08HouseRead Second Time (H)
2015-01-07HouseRead First Time (H)
2014-12-19HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback