MO HB275 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-30 - Second read and referred: Senate Small Business, Insurance, and Industry(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Requires all employers and business entities to enroll and actively participate in a federal work authorization program and imposes stricter penalties for employing an unauthorized alien

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires all employers and business entities to enroll and actively participate in a federal work authorization program and imposes stricter penalties for employing an unauthorized alien

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-30SenateSecond read and referred: Senate Small Business, Insurance, and Industry(S)
2013-04-25HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2013-04-25HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 104 NOES: 50
2013-04-25HouseTaken Up for Third Reading (H)
2013-04-23HousePerfected (H)
2013-04-23HouseHCS Adopted (H)
2013-04-23HouseTaken Up for Perfection (H)
2013-04-11HouseRules - Reported Do Pass (H)
2013-04-11HouseRules - Voted Do Pass (H)
2013-04-11HouseRules - Executive Session Completed (H)
2013-04-02HouseReferred: Rules(H)
2013-04-02HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H)
2013-03-27HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2013-03-27HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2013-02-13HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2013-01-31HouseReferred: International Trade(H)
2013-01-24HouseRead Second Time (H)
2013-01-23HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback