MO HB2720 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-05 - Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Administrative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-05 - Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Administrative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the Specialty Agricultural Crops Act
Title
Establishes the Specialty Agricultural Crops Act
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Knight [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-05 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2022-04-05 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 14 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-04-05 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2022-04-05 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2022-03-29 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2022-03-24 | House | Referred: Agriculture Policy(H) |
2022-02-22 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2022-02-16 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |