MO HB272 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-19 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Pending: Senate Health, Mental Health, Seniors And Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-19 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Pending: Senate Health, Mental Health, Seniors And Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the number of members on the MO HealthNet Oversight Committee from 18 to 19 by adding a licensed or registered nurse who cares for participants in the MO HealthNet Program
Title
Increases the number of members on the MO HealthNet Oversight Committee from 18 to 19 by adding a licensed or registered nurse who cares for participants in the MO HealthNet Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-19 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2011-04-18 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) | |
2011-04-07 | Second Read and Referred: Health, Mental Health, Seniors, and Familiest (S) | |
2011-04-05 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2011-04-05 | Third Read and Passed (H) | |
2011-04-04 | Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H) | |
2011-03-28 | Rules - Reported Do Pass Consent (H) | |
2011-03-28 | Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | |
2011-03-28 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-02-23 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2011-02-23 | Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) | |
2011-02-23 | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | |
2011-02-23 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-02-23 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2011-02-10 | Referred: Health Care Policy (H) | |
2011-01-24 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2011-01-20 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |