MO HB271 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-29 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-29 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires certain grant agreements to describe the State Auditor's authority with respect to property, equipment, and facilities purchased with the funds from the grant
Title
Requires certain grant agreements to describe the State Auditor's authority with respect to property, equipment, and facilities purchased with the funds from the grant
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-02 - House - HB 271 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 146 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-29 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 15, 2015, 2:00pm, Senate Committee Room 1 |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2015-04-06 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2015-04-02 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 146 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-04-02 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2015-03-31 | House | Perfected (H) |
2015-03-31 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2015-03-10 | House | Reported Do Pass with Amendments (H) - HCA 1 AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-03-09 | House | Voted Do Pass with Amendments (H) |
2015-03-09 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-03-05 | House | Rules - Returned to the Committee of Origin (H) |
2015-03-05 | House | Rules - Voted to Return to Committee of Origin (H) |
2015-03-05 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-03-02 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Rules(H) |
2015-03-02 | House | Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-03-02 | House | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2015-03-02 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-03-02 | House | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2015-03-02 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-02-17 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2015-01-27 | House | Referred: Government Oversight and Accountability(H) |
2015-01-08 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2015-01-07 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2014-12-19 | House | Prefiled (H) |