MO HB2676 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-15 - Referred: Conservation and Natural Resources(H)
Pending: House Conservation and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-15 - Referred: Conservation and Natural Resources(H)
Pending: House Conservation and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows feral hog hunting on public lands if the feral hog population of the state has not been eliminated by January 1, 2025.
Title
Allows feral hog hunting on public lands if the feral hog population of the state has not been eliminated by January 1, 2025.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Cupps [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-15 | House | Referred: Conservation and Natural Resources(H) |
2020-02-28 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2020-02-27 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB2676&year=2020&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/hlrbillspdf/5646H.01I.pdf |