MO HB2656 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-28 - Action Postponed (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-28 - Action Postponed (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designates a portion of State Highway P in St. Charles County as the "Waylon Jennings Memorial Highway".
Title
Designates a portion of State Highway P in St. Charles County as the "Waylon Jennings Memorial Highway".
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Action Postponed (H) |
2018-03-28 | House | Executive Session Continued |
2018-03-14 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2018-03-07 | House | Referred: Transportation(H) |
2018-03-05 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-03-01 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB2656&year=2018&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/hlrbillspdf/6675H.01I.pdf |