MO HB2650 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-26 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Energy and the Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-26 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Energy and the Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Specifies that the continuing authority requirement to obtain a construction or operating permit is satisfied if the applicant is a registered LLC or other business organization
Title
Specifies that the continuing authority requirement to obtain a construction or operating permit is satisfied if the applicant is a registered LLC or other business organization
Sponsors
Rep. Joe McGaugh [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2016-04-21 | House | Referred: Energy and the Environment(H) |
2016-03-02 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2016-03-01 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB2650&year=2016&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills161/billpdf/intro/HB2650I.PDF |