MO HB263 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-13 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-13 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires school districts to post certain financial information online for public access
Title
Requires school districts to post certain financial information online for public access
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-13 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-04-13 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-04-13 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-04-11 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2017-04-11 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-04-10 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-04-10 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-04-03 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred: Elementary and Secondary Education(H) |
2017-01-05 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2017-01-04 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2016-12-19 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB263&year=2017&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills171/hlrbillspdf/0437H.01I.pdf |