MO HB2614 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-07 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 1
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-07 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 1
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions of the employment security program
Title
Modifies provisions of the employment security program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-07 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 1 |
2024-04-30 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2024-04-30 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-04-25 | House | Referred: Rules - Regulatory Oversight(H) |
2024-04-24 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 1 |
2024-04-03 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2024-04-03 | House | Bill Reconsidered (H) |
2024-04-03 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-03-13 | House | Motion to Do Pass Failed (H) |
2024-03-13 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-03-06 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2024-02-29 | House | Referred: Workforce and Infrastructure Development(H) |
2024-02-05 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2024-02-01 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |