MO HB261 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-22 - Second read and referred: Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment(S)
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy And The Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-22 - Second read and referred: Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment(S)
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy And The Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Allows electrical corporations to charge for services based on the costs of certain construction work in progress
Title
Allows electrical corporations to charge for services based on the costs of certain construction work in progress
Sponsors
Rep. John Black [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-19 - House - House: HB 261 HBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 107 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - House: HB 261 HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 100 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - House: HB 261 HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 100 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-22 | Senate | Second read and referred: Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment(S) |
2021-04-19 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2021-04-19 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 107 NOES: 46 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-04-19 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2021-04-15 | House | Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H) |
2021-04-13 | House | Perfected (H) |
2021-04-13 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2021-04-13 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2021-03-23 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-03-23 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-03-23 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-03-10 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2021-03-10 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-03-10 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-03-10 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-02-24 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2021-02-04 | House | Referred: Utilities(H) |
2021-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2020-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |