MO HB2597 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Elections and Elected Officials Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Elections and Elected Officials Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies filing fees for political candidates.
Title
Modifies filing fees for political candidates.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2020-02-27 | House | Referred: Elections and Elected Officials(H) |
2020-02-26 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2020-02-25 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB2597&year=2020&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/hlrbillspdf/5602H.01I.pdf |