MO HB256 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-20 - SCS Reported Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-20 - SCS Reported Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Removes restrictions on when amber or white lights may be used on motor vehicles and equipment performing work for the department of transportation
Title
Removes restrictions on when amber or white lights may be used on motor vehicles and equipment performing work for the department of transportation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-14 - House - House: HB 256 HBs 3rd READING - CONSENT (Y: 155 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - House: HB 256 HBs 3rd READING - CONSENT (Y: 4 N: 149 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2017-03-14 - House - House: HB 256 HBs 3rd READING - CONSENT (Y: 4 N: 149 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-20 | House | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2017-04-20 | House | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass |
2017-04-13 | House | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2017-04-11 | House | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Thursday, April 13, 2017, 8:15am, Senate Lounge |
2017-03-28 | House | Second read and referred: Senate Transportation, Infrastructure, and Public Safety(S) |
2017-03-14 | House | Emergency Clause Defeated (H) - AYES: 4 NOES: 149 PRESENT: 3 |
2017-03-14 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 155 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-03-14 | House | Taken Up |
2017-03-01 | House | Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H) |
2017-02-21 | House | Reported Do Pass - Consent (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-02-21 | House | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2017-02-21 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-02-15 | House | Referred: Consent and House Procedure(H) |
2017-02-15 | House | Reported Do Pass - Consent (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-02-15 | House | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2017-02-15 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-02-08 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred: Transportation(H) |
2017-01-05 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2017-01-04 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2016-12-19 | House | Prefiled (H) |