MO HB255 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-01 - Placed on Informal Calendar - SA 1, SA 2, SA 3 adopted/SS and SA 5 pending
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-01 - Placed on Informal Calendar - SA 1, SA 2, SA 3 adopted/SS and SA 5 pending
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the "Missouri Works Program."
Title
Modifies the "Missouri Works Program."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-18 - House - House: HB 255 HBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 136 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar - SA 1, SA 2, SA 3 adopted/SS and SA 5 pending |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Senate Substitute Offered (S) |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Taken Up |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Executive Session Scheduled - Thursday, April 18, 2019, 9:00am, Bingham Conference Room |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Referred: Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 2, 2019, 10:30am, or upon morning recess, SCR 1 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Second read and referred: Economic Development (S) |
2019-02-18 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2019-02-18 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 136 NOES: 20 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-02-18 | House | Taken Up |
2019-02-18 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-02-18 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-02-18 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-02-14 | House | Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H) |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2019-02-12 | House | Perfected (H) |
2019-02-12 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2019-02-12 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2019-02-12 | House | Taken Up |
2019-02-07 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-02-06 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-02-06 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-02-05 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2019-02-05 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 14 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-02-04 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-02-04 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-01-28 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2019-01-16 | House | Referred: Workforce Development(H) |
2019-01-10 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-01-09 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2018-12-14 | House | Prefiled (H) |