MO HB255 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-28 - Rules - Reported Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Exempts, effective January 1, 2014, an animal shelter from the payment of any licensing and other fees under the provisions of the Animal Care Facilities Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Exempts, effective January 1, 2014, an animal shelter from the payment of any licensing and other fees under the provisions of the Animal Care Facilities Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-28HouseRules - Reported Do Pass (H)
2013-03-28HouseRules - Voted Do Pass (H)
2013-03-28HouseRules - Executive Session Completed (H)
2013-03-14HouseReferred: Rules(H)
2013-03-14HouseReported Do Pass (H)
2013-03-12HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2013-03-12HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2013-02-05HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2013-01-28HouseReferred: Ways and Means(H)
2013-01-23HouseRead Second Time (H)
2013-01-22HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback