MO HB2538 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-08 - Second read and referred: Senate Agriculture, Food Production, and Outdoor Resources(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-08 - Second read and referred: Senate Agriculture, Food Production, and Outdoor Resources(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Department of Natural Resources to submit a report to the General Assembly regarding maintenance, repair, and construction of state parks
Title
Requires the Department of Natural Resources to submit a report to the General Assembly regarding maintenance, repair, and construction of state parks
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-30 - House - House: HB 2538 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 146 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Agriculture, Food Production, and Outdoor Resources(S) |
2018-04-30 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2018-04-30 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 146 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-04-30 | House | Taken Up |
2018-04-25 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 adoptyed |
2018-04-25 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2018-04-25 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2018-04-05 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-04-04 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-04-04 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-03-28 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2018-03-28 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-03-28 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-03-28 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-03-14 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2018-03-07 | House | Referred: Conservation and Natural Resources(H) |
2018-02-26 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-02-22 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |