MO HB2531 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-26 - HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-26 - HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates provisions regarding submetering of utilities
Title
Creates provisions regarding submetering of utilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-26 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2024-03-26 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-03-12 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2024-02-22 | House | Referred: Local Government(H) |
2024-01-25 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2024-01-24 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |