MO HB2524 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-29 - HCS Reported Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-29 - HCS Reported Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions for the sunshine law and creates the transparency division within the office of the attorney general to monitor sunshine law violations by state agencies.
Title
Modifies provisions for the sunshine law and creates the transparency division within the office of the attorney general to monitor sunshine law violations by state agencies.
Sponsors
Rep. Jean Evans [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-29 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) |
2018-03-27 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-03-27 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-03-26 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2018-02-27 | House | Referred: General Laws(H) |
2018-02-22 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-02-21 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB2524&year=2018&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/hlrbillspdf/6474H.01I.pdf |