MO HB252 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-06 - SCS Voted Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes certain cities to levy a transient guest tax or food tax upon voter approval

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes certain cities to levy a transient guest tax or food tax upon voter approval

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-08 - House - House: HB 252 HBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 119 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-06SenateSCS Voted Do Pass (S)
2021-05-06SenateExecutive Session Held (S)
2021-04-28SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2021-04-26SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 28, 1:00 p.m., SCR 1
2021-04-15SenateSecond read and referred: Local Government and Elections(S)
2021-04-08HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2021-04-08HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 119 NOES: 33 PRESENT: 0
2021-04-08HouseTaken Up for Third Reading (H)
2021-04-07HousePlaced on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H)
2021-03-31HousePerfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 adopted
2021-03-31HouseHCS Adopted (H)
2021-03-31HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2021-03-31HouseTaken Up for Perfection (H)
2021-03-10HousePlaced on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
2021-03-04HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
2021-03-03HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2021-03-03HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2021-02-08HouseReferred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
2021-02-08HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2021-02-04HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2021-02-04HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2021-01-28HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2021-01-14HouseReferred: Local Government(H)
2021-01-07HouseRead Second Time (H)
2021-01-06HouseRead First Time (H)
2020-12-01HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB252&year=2021&code=R
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/hlrbillspdf/0319H.02I.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/hlrbillspdf/0319H.03C.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/hlrbillspdf/0319H.03P.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/0319H03.03H.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/sumpdf/HB0252I.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/fiscal/fispdf/0319H.02I.ORG.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/fiscal/fispdf/0319H.03C.ORG.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/sumpdf/HB0252C.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/fiscal/fispdf/0319H.03P.ORG.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/sumpdf/HB0252P.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/rollcalls/050.009.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback