MO HB251 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-14 - Placed on Informal Calendar - SA 3 to SA 2, SA 2 as amended, SS for SCS as amended pending
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Requires authorization for certain labor unions to use dues and fees to make political contributions and requires consent for withholding earnings from paychecks

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires authorization for certain labor unions to use dues and fees to make political contributions and requires consent for withholding earnings from paychecks

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-09 - House - House: HB 251 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 111 N: 43 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House: HB 251 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-14SenatePlaced on Informal Calendar - SA 3 to SA 2, SA 2 as amended, SS for SCS as amended pending
2017-03-14SenateTaken Up
2017-03-13SenatePlaced on Informal Calendar - SA 2 to SA 2 adopted/ SCS, SS for SCS and SA 2 pending
2017-03-13SenateSenate Substitute Offered (S)
2017-03-13SenateTaken Up
2017-03-08SenatePlaced on Informal Calendar
2017-03-02SenateReported Do Pass (S)
2017-03-02SenateExecutive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass
2017-03-01SenateExecutive Session Scheduled - Thursday, March 2, 2017, 9:30am,Bingham Conference Room
2017-03-01SenateReferred: Senate Fiscal Oversight(S)
2017-02-23SenateSCS Reported Do Pass (S)
2017-02-22SenateExecutive Session Held (S) - SCS Voted do pass
2017-02-22SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2017-02-20SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, February 22. 2017. 12:00pm, SCR 1
2017-02-16SenateSecond read and referred: Senate General Laws(S)
2017-02-13HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2017-02-09HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 95 NOES: 60 PRESENT: 0
2017-02-09HouseTaken Up
2017-02-07HousePerfected (H)
2017-02-07HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2017-02-07HouseTaken Up - HA 1 Withdrawn
2017-02-06HouseLaid Over (H) - HA 1 PENDING
2017-02-06HouseTaken Up
2017-01-31HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
2017-01-31HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2017-01-31HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2017-01-26HouseReferred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
2017-01-26HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
2017-01-25HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2017-01-25HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2017-01-24HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2017-01-05HouseReferred: Economic Development(H)
2017-01-05HouseRead Second Time (H)
2017-01-04HouseRead First Time (H)
2016-12-19HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback