MO HB2506 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-05 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 2
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Provides processes for the recorder of deeds to record electronic documents and procedures for remote online notarization

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides processes for the recorder of deeds to record electronic documents and procedures for remote online notarization

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-05HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 2
2018-04-04HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2018-04-04HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-03-15HouseReferred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
2018-03-15HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2018-03-14HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2018-03-14HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-03-07HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2018-02-27HouseReferred: Special Committee on Innovation and Technology(H)
2018-02-21HouseRead Second Time (H)
2018-02-20HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback