MO HB2501 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-13 - Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-13 - Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals the expiration date of the "Uniform Small Wireless Facility Deployment Act"
Title
Repeals the expiration date of the "Uniform Small Wireless Facility Deployment Act"
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Farnan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-13 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2024-03-13 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-03-06 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2024-02-22 | House | Referred: Utilities(H) |
2024-01-24 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2024-01-23 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |