MO HB2491 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Administrative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Administrative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions related to the virtual school program.
Title
Modifies provisions related to the virtual school program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2020-03-11 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-03-10 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-03-10 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-03-03 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2020-02-20 | House | Referred: Elementary and Secondary Education(H) |
2020-02-19 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2020-02-18 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |