MO HB2489 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Special Committee on Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Special Committee on Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows the state emergency management agency to enter into contracts to lease dredging equipment from the U.S. Army Corps of Engineers for flood prevention.
Title
Allows the state emergency management agency to enter into contracts to lease dredging equipment from the U.S. Army Corps of Engineers for flood prevention.
Sponsors
Rep. Louis Riggs [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2020-02-27 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Homeland Security(H) |
2020-02-19 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2020-02-18 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB2489&year=2020&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/hlrbillspdf/5049H.01I.pdf |