MO HB2485 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Special Committee on Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Special Committee on Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to nonsupport.
Title
Modifies provisions relating to nonsupport.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2020-02-28 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Criminal Justice(H) |
2020-02-19 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2020-02-18 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB2485&year=2020&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/hlrbillspdf/5148H.01I.pdf |