MO HB247 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-14 - Referred: Elementary and Secondary Education(H)
Pending: House Elementary And Secondary Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-14 - Referred: Elementary and Secondary Education(H)
Pending: House Elementary And Secondary Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Reduces public assistance benefits of individuals whose children do not meet school attendance requirements
Title
Reduces public assistance benefits of individuals whose children do not meet school attendance requirements
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Porter [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-14 | House | Referred: Elementary and Secondary Education(H) |
2021-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2020-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |