MO HB2460 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-07 - HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-07 - HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions governing income exempt from earnings tax
Title
Modifies provisions governing income exempt from earnings tax
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Murphy [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 1 |
2024-03-06 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2024-03-06 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-02-21 | House | Action Postponed (H) |
2024-02-21 | House | Executive Session Continued |
2024-02-07 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2024-01-25 | House | Referred: Economic Development(H) |
2024-01-22 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2024-01-18 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |