MO HB2458 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-25 - Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-25 - Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates provisions relating to emergency medical services
Title
Creates provisions relating to emergency medical services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-25 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2024-03-25 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-03-11 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2024-03-04 | House | Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H) |
2024-02-15 | House | Referred: Health and Mental Health Policy(H) |
2024-01-22 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2024-01-18 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |