MO HB2441 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-14 - Second read and referred: Senate Veterans' Affairs and Health(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-14 - Second read and referred: Senate Veterans' Affairs and Health(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Specifies that certain health care facilities operated by the state are not exempt from certificate of need requirements
Title
Specifies that certain health care facilities operated by the state are not exempt from certificate of need requirements
Sponsors
Rep. Caleb Jones [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-07 - House - House: HB 2441 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 131 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - House - House: HB 2441 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - House - House: HB 2441 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-14 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Veterans' Affairs and Health(S) |
2016-04-07 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2016-04-07 | House | Emergency Clause Defeated (H) - AYES: 90 NOES: 50 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-04-07 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 131 NOES: 10 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-04-07 | House | Taken Up |
2016-04-05 | House | Perfected (H) |
2016-04-05 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2016-04-05 | House | Taken Up |
2016-03-03 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-03-01 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-03-01 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-02-23 | House | Referred: Select Committee on General Laws(H) |
2016-02-23 | House | Reported Do Pass with Amendments (H) - HCA 1 AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-02-22 | House | Voted Do Pass with Amendments (H) |
2016-02-22 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-02-15 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2016-02-10 | House | Referred: Emerging Issues(H) |
2016-02-02 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2016-02-01 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |