MO HB243 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allows victims of certain crimes to be released from certain lease agreements if documentation is provided to the landlord.
Title
Allows victims of certain crimes to be released from certain lease agreements if documentation is provided to the landlord.
Sponsors
Rep. James Neely [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-17 - House - House: HB 243 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 139 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - House - House: HB 243 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 141 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House: HB 243 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 151 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - House - House: HB 243 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 141 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House: HB 243 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 151 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-09 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2019-07-09 | House | Approved by Governor (G) |
2019-05-29 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2019-05-29 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2019-05-29 | House | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2019-05-17 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 141 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-05-17 | House | House Adopts (H) - SCS AYES: 139 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-05-17 | House | Taken Up |
2019-05-17 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-05-17 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-05-17 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-05-16 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SCS |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Third Read and Passed (S) - AYES: 32 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | SCS Adopted (S) |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Taken Up |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2019-04-18 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2019-04-11 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass (S) |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Thursday, March 28, 2019, 9:00am, SCR 1 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Second read and referred: Small Business and Industry(S) |
2019-02-18 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2019-02-18 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 151 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-02-18 | House | Taken Up |
2019-02-13 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 adopted |
2019-02-13 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2019-02-13 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2019-02-13 | House | Taken Up |
2019-02-11 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-02-11 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-02-11 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-02-05 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2019-02-05 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-02-05 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-02-05 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-01-29 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2019-01-16 | House | Referred: Children and Families(H) |
2019-01-10 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-01-09 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2018-12-14 | House | Prefiled (H) |