MO HB243 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-13 - Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Administrative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-13 - Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Administrative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows utility companies to establish periodic rate adjustments outside of general rate proceedings
Title
Allows utility companies to establish periodic rate adjustments outside of general rate proceedings
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-13 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2017-03-13 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-03-01 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-03-01 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-02-22 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2017-01-26 | House | Referred: Utilities(H) |
2017-01-05 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2017-01-04 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2016-12-19 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB243&year=2017&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills171/hlrbillspdf/0752H.01I.pdf |