MO HB242 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-07 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-07 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding telecommunication practices
Title
Changes the laws regarding telecommunication practices
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Porter [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-29 - House - House: HB 242 HBs FOR THIRD READING - INFORMAL (Y: 147 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-07 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2021-05-06 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2021-05-05 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass (S) |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, May 5, 1:00 p.m., SCR 1 |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Second read and referred: Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment(S) |
2021-04-29 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2021-04-29 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 147 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 1 |
2021-04-29 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2021-04-29 | House | Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H) |
2021-04-26 | House | Perfected (H) |
2021-04-26 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2021-04-26 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2021-04-26 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2021-04-20 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2021-04-07 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-04-07 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-04-07 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-02-17 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2021-02-17 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 15 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-02-09 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-02-09 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-02-02 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2021-01-14 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Small Business(H) |
2021-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2020-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |