MO HB242 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-15 - SCS Voted Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-15 - SCS Voted Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions related to coroners and medical examiners.
Title
Modifies provisions related to coroners and medical examiners.
Sponsors
Rep. James Neely [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-21 - House - House: HB 242 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 150 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-15 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass (S) |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, April 8, 2019, 2:00pm, Senate Lounge |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Second read and referred: Professional Registration(S) |
2019-02-21 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2019-02-21 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 150 NOES: 6 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-02-21 | House | Taken Up |
2019-02-19 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 adopted |
2019-02-19 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2019-02-19 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2019-02-19 | House | Taken Up |
2019-02-14 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-02-14 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-02-14 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2019-02-07 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-02-06 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-02-06 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-01-30 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2019-01-17 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Aging(H) |
2019-01-10 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-01-09 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2018-12-14 | House | Prefiled (H) |