MO HB2411 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-07 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-07 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adds endangering the welfare of a child in the first degree to the definition of dangerous felony and modifies the offense of endangering the welfare of a child in the first degree
Title
Adds endangering the welfare of a child in the first degree to the definition of dangerous felony and modifies the offense of endangering the welfare of a child in the first degree
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-07 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2024-02-01 | House | Referred: Judiciary(H) |
2024-01-17 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2024-01-16 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |