MO HB241 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-10 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Retirement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-10 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Retirement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows a person employed by a public school for 17 hours or less per week to work at another public school if the total does not exceed 17 but cannot be combined to establish eligibility for retirement
Title
Allows a person employed by a public school for 17 hours or less per week to work at another public school if the total does not exceed 17 but cannot be combined to establish eligibility for retirement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-10 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2011-03-01 | Referred: Retirement (H) | |
2011-03-01 | Re-referred to Committee (H) | |
2011-01-27 | Referred: Elementary and Secondary Education (H) | |
2011-01-20 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2011-01-19 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB241&year=2011&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills111/biltxt/intro/HB0241I.htm |