MO HB2403 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-25 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-25 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designates the Lyceum Theatre in Arrow Rock, Missouri as the official state theatre.
Title
Designates the Lyceum Theatre in Arrow Rock, Missouri as the official state theatre.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-25 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-04-11 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-04-11 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-03-29 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2018-03-29 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-03-28 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-03-28 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-03-14 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2018-02-21 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Tourism(H) |
2018-02-08 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-02-07 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB2403&year=2018&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/hlrbillspdf/6343H.01I.pdf |