MO HB240 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Reported Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes the Joint Committee on Substance Abuse Prevention and Treatment

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes the Joint Committee on Substance Abuse Prevention and Treatment

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-25 - House - House: HB 240 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 142 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-09SenateReported Do Pass (S)
2019-05-08SenateVoted Do Pass (S)
2019-05-08SenateExecutive Session Held (S)
2019-05-07SenateExecutive Session Scheduled - Wednesday, May 8, 2019, 12:00pm, Bingham Conference Room
2019-05-06SenateReferred: Fiscal Oversight(S)
2019-05-02SenateSCS Reported Do Pass (S)
2019-04-25SenateSCS Voted Do Pass (S)
2019-04-25SenateExecutive Session Held (S)
2019-04-17SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2019-04-12SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 17, 2019, 8 a.m., Senate Lounge
2019-04-10SenateHearing Cancelled (S)
2019-04-05SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 10, 2019, 8:00 a.m., Senate Lounge
2019-04-04SenateSecond read and referred: Seniors, Families and Children(S)
2019-03-25HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2019-03-25HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 142 NOES: 6 PRESENT: 0
2019-03-25HouseTaken Up
2019-03-13HousePerfected (H)
2019-03-13HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2019-03-13HouseTaken Up
2019-02-14HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
2019-02-14HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2019-02-14HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2019-02-07HouseReferred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
2019-02-07HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2019-02-06HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2019-02-06HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2019-01-30HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2019-01-17HouseReferred: Special Committee on Aging(H)
2019-01-10HouseRead Second Time (H)
2019-01-09HouseRead First Time (H)
2018-12-13HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback