MO HB239 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-10 - Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H)
Pending: House Elementary And Secondary Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-10 - Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H)
Pending: House Elementary And Secondary Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that each child enrolled in kindergarten or first grade is to receive a comprehensive vision examination
Title
Provides that each child enrolled in kindergarten or first grade is to receive a comprehensive vision examination
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Kelley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-10 | House | Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H) |
2017-02-16 | House | Referred: Elementary and Secondary Education(H) |
2017-01-05 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2017-01-04 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2016-12-16 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB239&year=2017&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills171/hlrbillspdf/0142H.01I.pdf |