MO HB2370 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-17 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-17 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies appointments to the Missouri Consolidated Health Care Plan board of trustees.
Title
Modifies appointments to the Missouri Consolidated Health Care Plan board of trustees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-17 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2018-04-17 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-04-17 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-04-17 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-04-10 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2018-04-03 | House | Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H) |
2018-03-15 | House | Referred: General Laws(H) |
2018-02-05 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-02-01 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB2370&year=2018&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/hlrbillspdf/6273H.01I.pdf |