MO HB2369 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-09 - Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-09 - Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits public school membership in any statewide activities association that prohibits home school students from participating in any event or activity offered by the school district in which the student resides
Title
Prohibits public school membership in any statewide activities association that prohibits home school students from participating in any event or activity offered by the school district in which the student resides
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2022-04-28 | House | Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2022-04-11 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2022-03-31 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-03-31 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2022-03-31 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2022-03-09 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2022-03-09 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-03-07 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2022-03-07 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2022-01-31 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2022-01-27 | House | Referred: General Laws(H) |
2022-01-11 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2022-01-10 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |