MO HB2367 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-03 - HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-03 - HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Extends expiration dates for the Statewide Court Automation Fund and the Basic Civil Legal Services Fund
Title
Extends expiration dates for the Statewide Court Automation Fund and the Basic Civil Legal Services Fund
Sponsors
Rep. Joe McGaugh [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-03 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-03-02 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-03-02 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-02-18 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Judiciary(H) |
2016-02-18 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-02-17 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-02-17 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-02-10 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2016-02-04 | House | Referred: Civil and Criminal Proceedings(H) |
2016-01-26 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2016-01-25 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |