MO HB2348 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-02 - Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-02 - Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to political subdivisions
Title
Modifies provisions relating to political subdivisions
Sponsors
Rep. Barry Hovis [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-02 | House | Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2024-04-16 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2024-04-15 | House | Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2024-04-09 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2024-03-28 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2024-03-26 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2024-03-26 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-03-14 | House | Referred: Rules - Regulatory Oversight(H) |
2024-03-13 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2024-03-12 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2024-03-12 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-02-27 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2024-02-15 | House | Referred: Local Government(H) |
2024-01-10 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2024-01-09 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |