MO HB2343 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Administrative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Administrative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to public water systems.
Title
Modifies provisions relating to public water systems.
Sponsors
Rep. Lynn Morris [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2020-03-10 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-03-09 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-03-09 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-02-17 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred: Conservation and Natural Resources(H) |
2020-02-03 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2020-01-30 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB2343&year=2020&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/hlrbillspdf/5216H.01I.pdf |