MO HB2342 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Utilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Utilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the law regarding the Universal Service Board
Title
Changes the law regarding the Universal Service Board
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2018-02-15 | House | Referred: Utilities(H) |
2018-02-01 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-01-31 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB2342&year=2018&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/hlrbillspdf/6034H.01I.pdf |