MO HB2337 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-14 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-14 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies fee requirements for insurance companies.
Title
Modifies fee requirements for insurance companies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-09 - House - House: HB 2337 HBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 121 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-14 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Executive Session Scheduled - Friday, May 11, 2018, 9:00am, Bingham Conference Room |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Referred: Senate Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2018-05-07 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Executive Session Scheduled - Wednesday, April 25, 2018, 9:07am, Bingham Conference Room |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 18, 2018, 10:01am, SCR 1 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Insurance and Banking(S) |
2018-04-09 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2018-04-09 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 121 NOES: 29 PRESENT: 1 |
2018-04-09 | House | Taken Up |
2018-04-05 | House | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2018-03-28 | House | Perfected (H) |
2018-03-28 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2018-03-28 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2018-03-28 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2018-03-01 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-02-28 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-02-28 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-02-07 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2018-02-07 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-02-06 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-02-06 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-02-06 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2018-02-05 | House | Referred: Insurance Policy(H) |
2018-02-01 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-01-31 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |